This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 20:24:58 (UTC).

CARRASQUILLO RAFAEL vs. GARCIA MARIA

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 CARRASQUILLO RAFAEL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARCIA MARIA. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00WH

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRASQUILLO RAFAEL

Defendant

GARCIA MARIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketReason: FH_DOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 08/01/2018 09:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketDEFAULT MARIA GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED / MARIA GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FINANCIAL- RAFAEL CARRASQUILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketCLERK'S DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less