This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 01/12/2023 at 02:16:45 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. vs. MOLINA, ARMANNI

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MOLINA, ARMANNI. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN B FLYNN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN B FLYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Defendant

MOLINA, ARMANNI

Winter Haven, FL 33880-2162

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI MICHAEL THIEL

4417 Beach Boulevard Suite 300, P O Box 47718

Jacksonville, FL 32247

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT BREACH OF CONTRACT

11/29/2022: COMPLAINT BREACH OF CONTRACT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/10/2023; Court Time: 11:00 AM; Location: BARTOW 5 B RED ELEVATOR; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: M2; Judge: MARY CATHERINE GREEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ARMANNI MOLINA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • FinancialDate: 11/30/2022; Amount: 310.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9407525

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 01/10/2023 11:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT BREACH OF CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel