This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/19/2022 at 23:27:03 (UTC).

CALABAY PARC HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. TAVAREZ LEIDY LUCIA

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 CALABAY PARC HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TAVAREZ LEIDY LUCIA. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CATHERINE L COMBEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CATHERINE L COMBEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALABAY PARC HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

TAVAREZ, LEIDY LUCIA

Davenport, FL 33837

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LEIDY LUCIA TAVAREZ

Davenport, FL 33837

LIEN SOLUTION

C/O Elio Avrilien, 20900 Ne 30Th Ave, Suite 200

Aventura, FL 33180

ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS AND OWNERS

Davenport, FL 33837

ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS / OWNERS NKA ROSSY TAVAREZ

Davenport, FL 33837

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIMASI JOHN L

801 N Orange Ave Ste 500

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

10/05/2021: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

10/05/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- LIEN SOLUTIONS BY SERVING PATRICIA GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LEIDY LUCIA TAVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - LEIDY LUCIA TAVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • FinancialDate: 10/11/2021; Amount: 445.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: LAW OFFICES OF JOHN L. DI MASI; Receipt Number: 8887468

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ ALL UNKNOWN TENNATS OWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/LEIDY LUCIA TAVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE LIEN AND FOR MONETARY DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALABAY PARC HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIMASI JOHN L