This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 02:20:58 (UTC).

BUTLER, TAMMY LANORE

Case Summary

On 04/06/2018 BUTLER, TAMMY LANORE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Decedent

BUTLER, TAMMY LANORE

Not Yet Classified

BUTLER, SHAWN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED - (FORMAL) - ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 11/22/19 @ 10:00 6B1 -STARGEL- STATUS OF CASE/ NEW ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketReason: STAT_HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 11/22/2019 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - 08/22/19, 9:30AM, STARGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketReason: MOT_WD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 08/22/2019 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketOATH PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE/ CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOATH PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-OPENS FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less