This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 13:58:10 (UTC).

BULLINGTON LISA JORENE vs. EICHHOLTZ BARBARA LEA'ANN

Case Summary

On 05/22/2018 BULLINGTON LISA JORENE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against EICHHOLTZ BARBARA LEA'ANN. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BULLINGTON ROBERT MARION

BULLINGTON LISA JORENE

Defendants

JORDAN JAMES TRAVIS (DECEASED)

EICHHOLTZ BARBARA LEA'ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketFINAL ORDER FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketReason: FH_CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 07/09/2018 11:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketBIRTH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketBIRTH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketBIRTH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketLEA ANN EICHHOLTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND CONSENT FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY - BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less