This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 15:56:30 (UTC).

BROWN, ALMA JANE

Case Summary

On 10/29/2018 BROWN, ALMA JANE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

BROWN, KENNETH CHARLES

BROWN, GREGORY THOMAS

BROWN, LAURIE LYNN

Decedents

BROWN, ALMA JANE

BROWN, JANE H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE-CLOSES FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketWAIVER ACCT./SERVICE PET.DISCH./CONSENT/RECEIPT - LAURIE BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketSATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM - WATSON CLINIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketWAIVER ACCT./SERVICE PET.DISCH./CONSENT/RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketFINAL ACCOUNTING (ESTATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketPETITION DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PR- $0.00 BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL) AKA JANE H BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE / CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketOATH PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-OPENS FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less