This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 18:40:47 (UTC).

BROOME NADRIAH RAANA vs. MCKINLEY KARRON LEE

Case Summary

On 09/26/2018 BROOME NADRIAH RAANA filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against MCKINLEY KARRON LEE. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is REINALDO J OJEDA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

REINALDO J OJEDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROOME NADRIAH RAANA

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Defendant

MCKINLEY, KARRON LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketReason: FAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 01/26/2020 08:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketBOOK IN SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketORDER FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketMEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketLETTER-ANGEL HICKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDOCTORS NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED PICK UP ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE AT ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketMOTION UNSIGNED DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less