This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 19:02:15 (UTC).

BOSTICK R. MARK vs. B2 FIE VII LLC

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 BOSTICK R MARK filed an Other lawsuit against B2 FIE VII LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN L SELPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEVEN L SELPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOSTICK, R. MARK

Defendants

B2 FIE VII LLC

C/O Corporation Service Co., Ra, 251 Little Falls Dr.

Wilmington, DE 19808

COMCAR INDUSTRIES, INC.

C/O Corporation Service Co., R.A., 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER MARK NELSON

P O Box 3

Lakeland, FL 33802

Defendant Attorney

PUTERBAUGH ROBERT EUGENE

Po Box 24628

Lakeland, FL 33802

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF FILING - ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/06/2020: NOTICE OF FILING - ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-COMCAR INDUSTRIES INC

12/09/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-COMCAR INDUSTRIES INC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-B2 FIE VII LLC

12/09/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-B2 FIE VII LLC

PETITION TO VACATE MODIFY ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COST INCLUDING

12/05/2019: PETITION TO VACATE MODIFY ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COST INCLUDING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/05/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • FinancialDate: 12/09/2019; Amount: 420.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: GRAYROBINSON, P.A.; Receipt Number: 8197011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-COMCAR INDUSTRIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-B2 FIE VII LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketEXPERT FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION TO VACATE MODIFY ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COST INCLUDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Comcar Industries Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER, MARK NELSON