This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 02:43:19 (UTC).

BLANKSCHAEN, JUDITH WILMA

Case Summary

On 09/07/2018 BLANKSCHAEN, JUDITH WILMA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

FRANK, LISA L

FRANK, NELSON FREDRICK

FRANK, ELIZABETH ANGELIQUE

MILLER, CLYDE RAYMOND JR

Decedent

BLANKSCHAEN, JUDITH WILMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

CHAVERNAY MARLA E

1218 Oakfield Drive

Brandon, FL 33511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING UNTIL - 09/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketPETITION EXTEND TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketWATSON CLINIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketANSWER/RESPONSE - WATSON CLINIC LLP/ GEORGE R BREZINA JR PA - IN RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO CLAIM OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketPROOF SERVICE OBJECTION TO CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE - OBJECTION TO CLAIM- WATSON CLINIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketOBJECTION TO CLAIM- WATSON CLINIC LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE- BOND WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE / CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (E-FILED COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketWAIVER PRIORITY/NOTICE/BOND & CONSENT APPT PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketWAIVER PRIORITY/NOTICE/BOND & CONSENT APPT PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketWAIVER PRIORITY/NOTICE/BOND & CONSENT APPT PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketOATH PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-OPENS FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less