This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 10/04/2021 at 22:02:40 (UTC).

BERGER, PAT vs. BURLINGTON STORES

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 BERGER, PAT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BURLINGTON STORES. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HOPE M PATTEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00LK

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HOPE M PATTEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERGER, PAT

Lakeland, FL 33809-

Defendants

BURLINGTON STORES

Sylvia Vent, Store Manager, 3800 Us Hwy 98 N #510

Lakeland, FL 33809-

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA LLC,

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/05/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

VIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR - BURLINGTON STORES

09/08/2021: VIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR - BURLINGTON STORES

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 10/11/2021; Court Time: 9:00 AM; Location: LAKELAND VIRTUAL COURTROOM; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: L1; Judge: HOPE M PATTEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - BURLINGTON STORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR - BURLINGTON STORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 10/11/2021 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 09/13/2021 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR NEW SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED - BURLINGTON STORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketVIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR - BURLINGSTON STORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 09/13/2021 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON STORES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant