Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/21/2021 at 21:08:57 (UTC).

BELLAMY REGINAL vs. RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 BELLAMY REGINAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELLAMY, REGINAL

Defendants

RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC

11380 Prosperity Farms Road #221E

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

DOE JOHN

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC

11380 Prosperity Farms Road #221E

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEMP ADAM

2012 S Florida Ave

Lakeland, FL 33803

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

09/03/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • DocketREPLY TO DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEFENDNT RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLCS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketAMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT BEFORE ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC BY SERVING KRYSTLE PARKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • FinancialDate: 09/08/2020; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MORGAN AND MORGAN TAMPA PA; Receipt Number: 8449569

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEMP ADAM