This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 22:50:37 (UTC).

BARNHART TIMOTHY R vs. BARNHART KIMBERLY

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 BARNHART TIMOTHY R filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BARNHART KIMBERLY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00WH

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARNHART TIMOTHY R

Defendant

BARNHART KIMBERLY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketReason: FH_DOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 04/17/2019 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT KIMBERLY BARNHART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketMOTION UNSIGNED DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less