This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 12:57:31 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA vs. PLADZIEWICZ NANCY A

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PLADZIEWICZ NANCY A. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

PLADZIEWICZ, NANCY A

Lake Wales, FL 33859-5720

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

01/18/2018: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- NANCY A PLADZIEWICZ

01/18/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- NANCY A PLADZIEWICZ

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY-NANCY ANN PLADZIEWICZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DispositionParty: NANCY A PLADZIEWICZ; Disposition Code: DFLT; Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Date: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - RECEIVED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING-AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT - NANCY A PLADZIEWICZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - NANCY A PLADZIEWICZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • FinancialDate: 01/18/2018; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: LAUREN N TURNER ESQ.; Receipt Number: 7459454

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- NANCY A PLADZIEWICZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less