This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 21:48:40 (UTC).

BAKER, ROBERT JOSEPH S

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 BAKER, ROBERT JOSEPH S was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Decedent

BAKER, ROBERT JOSEPH S

Not Yet Classified

BAKER, MICHAEL ANTHONY S

BAKER, ROBERT J. J

BOOKER, DONNA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION-CLOSES SUMADM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR SUBSEQUENT ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (SUBSEQ PETITION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION-CLOSES SUMADM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketPAID FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketCONSENT/WAIVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketCONSENT/WAIVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketPETITION DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketPETITION DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketPETITION SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION-OPENS SUMADM

    Read MoreRead Less