This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 22:12:03 (UTC).

BAIRD JILL M vs. BAIRD ANDREW JUSTIN

Case Summary

On 06/12/2018 BAIRD JILL M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BAIRD ANDREW JUSTIN. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAIRD JILL M

Defendant

BAIRD ANDREW JUSTIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING / MOTION TO ABATE DIVORCE PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 10/25/2018 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketMOTION TO ABATE DIVORSE PROCEEDINGS FOR 90 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED / ANDREW JUSTIN BAIRD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED ANDREW JUSTIN BAIRD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketReason: MOT_TEMP_RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 10/25/2018 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketWIFES VERIFIED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketWIFES VERIFED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less