This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/10/2021 at 03:43:22 (UTC).

AYERS MICHAEL L. vs. COCKRELL SAMANTHA L.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 AYERS MICHAEL L filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COCKRELL SAMANTHA L. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CATHERINE L COMBEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CATHERINE L COMBEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AYERS MICHAEL L.

Lakeland, FL 33801

Defendants

HUBBELL POWER SYSTEMS INC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-

COCKRELL SAMANTHA L.

Lake Wales, FL 33898

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENRY DAVID G

2012 S Florida Avenue

Lakeland, FL 33803

Defendant Attorney

AYRES RAYMOND F II

4350 West Cypress Street Meridian One Suite 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS

01/06/2021: DEFENDANTS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS

UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE- RECEIVED BY JUDGE

01/05/2021: UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE- RECEIVED BY JUDGE

UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE

01/05/2021: UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/30/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST

12/22/2020: PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST

PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED LIST OF WITNESSES FOR TRIAL

12/22/2020: PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED LIST OF WITNESSES FOR TRIAL

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING CHALLENGE OF JURORS DURING VOIR DIRE

12/10/2020: PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING CHALLENGE OF JURORS DURING VOIR DIRE

MOTION IN LIMINE

12/10/2020: MOTION IN LIMINE

REPLY TO DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/08/2020: REPLY TO DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

05/07/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

05/07/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/07/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/07/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/07/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/07/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT

05/07/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/07/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/07/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 08/17/2021; Court Time: 9:00 AM; Location: CIVIL DIVISION 07 VIRTUAL; Motion: PTC - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: 07; Judge: CATHERINE L COMBEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDELIVERED ENVELOPE- RECEIVED BY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDELIVERED ENVELOPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED LIST OF WITNESSES FOR TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING CHALLENGE OF JURORS DURING VOIR DIRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION IN LIMINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ HUBBELL POWER SYSEMS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less