This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/18/2022 at 01:01:13 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs. RUHSTORFER, HOPE

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUHSTORFER, HOPE. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY CATHERINE GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARY CATHERINE GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

RUHSTORFER, HOPE

Mulberry, FL 33860

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN ASHLEY L

P O Box 48979

Tampa, FL 33646

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/04/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/04/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

06/04/2021: SUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

VIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR- HOPE RUHSTORFER

06/10/2021: VIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR- HOPE RUHSTORFER

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED HOPE RUHSTORFER

06/29/2021: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED HOPE RUHSTORFER

STIPULATION ($3,129.78)

07/22/2021: STIPULATION ($3,129.78)

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL

07/27/2021: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS BREACH OF STIPULATION AGREEMENT AND MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

08/19/2021: NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS BREACH OF STIPULATION AGREEMENT AND MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

08/19/2021: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

08/19/2021: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANTS DEFAULT

08/19/2021: PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANTS DEFAULT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

09/02/2021: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

FINAL JUDGMENT

09/10/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialDate: 12/13/2021; Amount: 13.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES PC; Receipt Number: 8957208

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DispositionParty: HOPE RUHSTORFER; Disposition Code: RECL; Description: RECLOSED; Date: 09/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANTS DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFENDANTS BREACH OF STIPULATION AGREEMENT AND MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DispositionParty: HOPE RUHSTORFER; Disposition Code: DSBH; Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Date: 07/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 07/28/2021 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION ($3,129.78)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED HOPE RUHSTORFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR- HOPE RUHSTORFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialDate: 06/09/2021; Amount: 310.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: ERIK ZOGG; Receipt Number: 8745172

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 07/28/2021 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHLEY L BROWN