This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 16:17:06 (UTC).

ALVARADO, ISMAEL S vs. AQUA GREEN SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 ALVARADO, ISMAEL S filed an Other lawsuit against AQUA GREEN SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN L BARBER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN L BARBER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVARADO, ISMAEL

Defendant

AQUA GREEN SERVICES LLC

746 Bucklin Loop

Myrtle Beach, SC 29579

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAYES ROBERT S

441 West Vine Street

Kissimmee, FL 34741

Defendant Attorney

TORRES-ALVARADO NATLY

390 N Orange Avenue Suite 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/05/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

02/05/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

02/05/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • DispositionParty: AQUA GREEN SERVICES LLC; Disposition Code: DSBH; Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Date: 05/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, AQUA GREEN SERVICES, LLC AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - AQUA GREEN SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialDate: 02/10/2020; Amount: 415.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: ROBERT S. HAYES P.A.; Receipt Number: 8264582

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-AQUA GREEN SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYES, ROBERT S.