This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County on 09/11/2021 at 22:12:34 (UTC).

ACAR LEASING LTD vs. CHICKEY JOHN

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 ACAR LEASING LTD filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against CHICKEY JOHN. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D SITES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D SITES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACAR LEASING LTD DBA GM FINANCIAL LEASING

Defendant

CHICKEY, JOHN

Lake Alfred, FL 33850

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ECHOLS BERT

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38120

 

Court Documents

AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC., DBA GM FINANCIAL MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

07/13/2021: AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC., DBA GM FINANCIAL MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/13/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 08/25/2021; Court Time: 11:30 AM; Location: CIVIL DIVISION 15 VIRTUAL; Motion: OTSC - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Section: 15; Judge: WILLIAM D SITES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - STREAMLINED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED JOHN CHICKEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketReason: OTSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 08/25/2021 11:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • FinancialDate: 07/15/2021; Amount: 495.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: ROBERT FEHSE; Receipt Number: 8788192

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - JOHN CHICKEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC., DBA GM FINANCIAL MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACAR LEASING LTD. AKA GM FINANCIAL LEASING LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ECHOLS BERT