This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/06/2021 at 12:29:07 (UTC).

2013-1 IH BORROWER LP vs. BURCH, CHARLES

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 2013-1 IH BORROWER LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BURCH, CHARLES. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI A WINSTEAD and KEVIN M KOHL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LORI A WINSTEAD

KEVIN M KOHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2013-1 IH BORROWER LP

Defendants

BURCH, CHARLES

Poinciana, FL 34759

HERRMANN, ARIELLE

Poinciana, FL 34759-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS MICHAEL GEO F

2753 Sr 580 Ste 209

Clearwater, FL 33761

 

Court Documents

EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED BY CLERK-CHARLES BURCH

03/03/2020: EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED BY CLERK-CHARLES BURCH

EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED BY CLERK-ARIELLE HERRMANN

03/03/2020: EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED BY CLERK-ARIELLE HERRMANN

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • DispositionParty: ARIELLE HERRMANN; Disposition Code: DSBH; Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Date: 03/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DispositionParty: CHARLES BURCH; Disposition Code: DSBH; Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Date: 03/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL / DEFENDANT(S) PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - CHARLES BURCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - ARIELLE HERMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • FinancialDate: 03/03/2020; Amount: 205.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MIKE G DAVIS; Receipt Number: 8292515

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED BY CLERK-CHARLES BURCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED BY CLERK-ARIELLE HERRMANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 2013-1 IH BORROWER LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL GEORGE F DAVIS