This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/21/2023 at 06:28:41 (UTC).

ZACHARY STEPHEN ASH Vs. CAROLYN A ASH

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 ZACHARY STEPHEN ASH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CAROLYN A ASH. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, 501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-FD

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ASH, ZACHARY STEPHEN

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Respondent

ASH, CAROLYN A

St Petersburg, FL 33702

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCC JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Doc # 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketSIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION HEARING; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION Doc # 12; Vol./Book 22288, Page 57, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketFAMILY - CASE DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 11; (TELEPHONIC) 120722 @ 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; ASH, ZACHARY STEPHEN; Total Financial Assessment; 421.00; Total Payments and Credits; 421.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2022-11581; ASH, CAROLYN ANN; (421.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; ASH, ZACHARY STEPHEN; Total Financial Assessment; 421.00; Total Payments and Credits; 421.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; ASH, ZACHARY STEPHEN; Total Financial Assessment; 421.00; Total Payments and Credits; 421.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 414.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER DEFENDANT - RESPONDENT Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING PARTIES Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE Doc # 8; Party:; ASH, ZACHARY STEPHEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE Doc # 9; Party:; ASH, CAROLYN A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCHANGE OF ADDRESS Doc # 10; FOR SPOUSE 1 AS OF 120922 (updated)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less