This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/24/2022 at 08:28:49 (UTC).

YANITSI BACERIO FERNANDEZ Vs. SUNDESH INC , DOING BUSINESS AS AMERICAN TECHICAL SERVICES HEATING AIR CONDITIONING, A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 YANITSI BACERIO FERNANDEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SUNDESH INC , DOING BUSINESS AS AMERICAN TECHICAL SERVICES HEATING AIR CONDITIONING, A FLORIDA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BACERIO FERNANDEZ, YANITSI

Defendant

SUNDESH INC A FLORIDA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS AMERICAN TECHICAL SERVICES HEATING AIR CONDITIONING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN D ANDREOPOULOS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/25/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/25/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF FILING

10/26/2022: NOTICE OF FILING

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom336715928

10/27/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

11/03/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT

11/29/2022: STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS - CASE DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketREFERRAL TO MEDIATION FROM SC PRETRIAL Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketSTIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT; Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 4; 11012022; Party:; SUNDESH INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 3; EXHIBITS TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BACERIO FERNANDEZ, YANITSI; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-38492; BACERIO FERNANDEZ, YANITSI; (310.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BACERIO FERNANDEZ, YANITSI; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less