This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 10/26/2021 at 07:09:28 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC, DOING BUSINESS AS WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES Vs. AZAEL PEREZ PEREZ

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC, DOING BUSINESS AS WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AZAEL PEREZ PEREZ. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DOING BUSINESS AS WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

1 5Th Avenue S

Lake Worth, FL 33460

Defendant

PEREZ, AZAEL PEREZ

Seminole, FL 33777

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMIRO GUSTAVO KRUSS

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN PA

806 Douglas Road Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom330371084

10/08/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

10/05/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

10/05/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

10/05/2021: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/05/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/05/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-38475; WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC, D/B/A WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 5; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRUSS, RAMIRO GUSTAVO