This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 12/23/2020 at 17:10:26 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA Vs. UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC OF WILLIAM A CIANCIOLO JR DECEASED, et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2015 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC OF WILLIAM A CIANCIOLO JR DECEASED,. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CAPITAL ONE BANK

CIANCIOLO, CYNTHIA ANN ALSO KNOWN AS LOFT, CYNTHIA ANN

CIANCIOLO, MICHAEL ALLAN

CIANCIOLO, WILLIAM ALBERT, JR

COLE, SANDRA LEE

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC OF WILLIAM A CIANCIOLO DECEASED

Assignee

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN ADMINISTRATOR ATTORNEY A LITEM

04/07/2015: MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN-ADMINISTRATOR-ATTORNEY A LITEM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/25/2015: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/25/2015: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

03/25/2015: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

EXHIBIT

11/11/2015: EXHIBIT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/25/2015: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CERTIFICATE

01/25/2015: CERTIFICATE

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

03/25/2015: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF FILING

09/03/2015: NOTICE OF FILING

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Vol./Book 19065, Page 654, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,168.00; Total Payments and Credits; 1,168.00; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2016-00555; MARIA KOMHLAN; (49.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,168.00; Total Payments and Credits; 1,168.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketJUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); REC VER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE; FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,168.00; Total Payments and Credits; 1,168.00; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2016-00520; MARIA KOMHLAN; (70.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,168.00; Total Payments and Credits; 1,168.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketASSIGNMENT; OF JDMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketATTACHMENT; LIMITED POWER OF ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 1/26/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 1/26/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 1/26/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 1/26/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 1/26/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 1/26/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 1/26/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 1/26/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 1/26/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2015
  • DocketFORM A-PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant