This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/08/2021 at 16:03:31 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA vs. STAIRPARTS AND MILLWORK UNLIMITED INC, et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2011 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against STAIRPARTS AND MILLWORK UNLIMITED INC,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

BAPTISTE, DAVID

DOE 1

DOE 2

MIDDLEKAUFF, JANET H

MIDDLEKAUFF, WALTER J

MORROW, JOHN S

MORROW, PATRICIA R

STAIRPARTS AND MILLWORK UNLIMITED INC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

04/20/2012: NOTICE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

12/22/2011: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/14/2011: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/26/2011: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE

05/27/2011: RESPONSE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/25/2011: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER GRANTING

04/12/2011: ORDER GRANTING

PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

05/01/2012: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

JOINT STIPULATION

09/02/2011: JOINT STIPULATION

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2013
  • DocketREOPEN - CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • DocketNOTICE; OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • DocketCERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: F; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR17595PG1643-001; VER: R; K; Vol./Book 17595, Page 1643, 001 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VER: F; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketRealauction Electronic Sale - Fee Charged $; Comment: REALAUCTION ELECTRONIC SALE FEE CHARGED $49.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketDoc Stamps - Fee Charged $; Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE CHARGED $.70; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • DocketCertificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $70.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketLis Pendens Recording - Fee Paid $; Comment: LIS PENDENS RECORDING FEE PAID - $27.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketTEXT; Comment: REPLEVIN FEE PAID $85.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketCircuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $1905.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Comment: LIS PENDENS; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 015 BY 2594 - RANDOM MF; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant