Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/08/2021 at 12:15:27 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA Vs. JESSICA BAYLY

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JESSICA BAYLY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY, LORRAINE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CO

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY, LORRAINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

2743 Hollywood Blvd

Hollywood, FL 33020

Defendant

BAYLY, JESSICA

St Petersburg, FL 33711

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMIR NADERPOUR

Attorney at NADERPOUR & ASSOCIATES PA

2743 Hollywood Blvd

Hollywood, FL 33020

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

06/12/2020: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

STIPULATION

06/09/2020: STIPULATION

NOTICE OF FILING

01/17/2020: NOTICE OF FILING

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

01/13/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

01/13/2020: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

01/13/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

01/13/2020: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

01/13/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ANSWER OF

09/20/2019: ANSWER OF

ALIAS SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

09/09/2019: ALIAS SUMMONS - SERVED

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

08/15/2019: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT

11/16/2020: AFFIDAVIT

SUMMONS - RETURNED NOT SERVED

07/11/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED NOT SERVED

COMPLAINT

06/17/2019: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

06/17/2019: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

06/17/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/17/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

06/17/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 22; Vol./Book 21308, Page 1541, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Doc # 21; OF NON-PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 18; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketDISMISSED-SETTLEMENT AFTER HRG (SRS DISPO); Doc # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketORDER APPROVING (R); Doc # 20; STIPULATION OF SETTLEEMENT AND DISMISSING CASE; Vol./Book 21041, Page 2105, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Doc # 17; OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 15; AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS ATTORNEYS' FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Doc # 16; OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS' FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Doc # 10; AGAINST DEFT JESSICA BAYLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK NA; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS; Doc # 7; ISSUED; Party: BAYLY, JESSICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT SERVED; Doc # 6; Party: BAYLY, JESSICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK NA; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-22829; WELLS FARGO BANK NA; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK NA; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 2; ISSUED; Party: BAYLY, JESSICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 5; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIR NADERPOUR