This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/26/2020 at 18:47:06 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA Vs. JAMES E HARRIS , JR, et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2015 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JAMES E HARRIS , JR,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHAEFER, JOHN A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHAEFER, JOHN A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

HARRIS , JAMES E, JR ALSO KNOWN AS HARRIS, JAMES E

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES E HARRIS JR

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESCHED ONLINE SALE

06/20/2016: ORDER RESCHED ONLINE SALE

SUMMONS - RETURNED NOT SERVED

08/31/2015: SUMMONS - RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

08/31/2015: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF FILING

01/06/2016: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF SALE

06/07/2016: NOTICE OF SALE

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

08/31/2015: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

09/21/2016: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

ORDER RESCHED ONLINE SALE

09/21/2016: ORDER RESCHED ONLINE SALE

MOTION

09/21/2016: MOTION

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketRETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketCANCELED; JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); ORDER FROM COURT; CANCELLED PER ORDER PER JUDGE SCHAEFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; RCVD BY COUORT 122916

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketORDER; TO VACATE FINAL JDMT/CANCEL SALE 011817/DISMISS ACTION/DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS/RTN ORIGNAL DOCS; Vol./Book 19471, Page 966, 2 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketCANCELED; JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); ORDER FROM COURT; CANCELLED PER COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,067.50; Total Payments and Credits; 1,067.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-32190; WELLS FARGO BANK NA; (50.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,067.50; Total Payments and Credits; 1,067.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketMOTION; TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE SALE; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Vol./Book 18880, Page 1103, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketNOTICE TO HOMEOWNER; FORM C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET; FORM D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 8/5/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 8/5/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 8/5/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 8/5/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 8/5/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant