This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/22/2020 at 21:37:12 (UTC).

WALL TOWER LLC Vs. OLGA ROSARIO

Case Summary

On 02/02/2015 WALL TOWER LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against OLGA ROSARIO. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CO

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALL TOWER LLC

Defendant

ROSARIO, OLGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JESSICA STEWART

Attorney at BERLIN PATTEN EBLING PLLC

8130 Lakewood Ranch Main Street Suite 206

Lakewood Ranch, FL 34202

ANDREW MOONEY, ESQ

Attorney at FREEDOM LAW GROUP

3639 Cortez Road West Suite 111

Bradenton, FL 34210

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

02/02/2015: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

02/02/2015: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/02/2015: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/02/2015: COMPLAINT

CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE

01/19/2016: CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE

MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

03/08/2016: MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL NOTICE

01/04/2016: DISMISSAL NOTICE

DISMISSAL NOTICE

01/04/2016: DISMISSAL NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketDISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketMASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL; ROSARIO, OLGA; Vol./Book 19120, Page 1646, 3 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE; RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION -- NOT ATTORNEY OF CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WALL TOWER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2015-04230; WALL TOWER LLC; (310.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WALL TOWER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 020315

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less