Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 05/23/2021 at 08:24:16 (UTC).

WALL HEALTHCARE INC, DOING BUSINESS AS TAMPA BAY ORTHOPEDIC AND SPINE, AS PATIENT PHUONG CHAU Vs. PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 WALL HEALTHCARE INC, DOING BUSINESS AS TAMPA BAY ORTHOPEDIC AND SPINE, AS PATIENT PHUONG CHAU filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WALL HEALTHCARE INC

7171 N Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

WALL HEALTHCARE INC AS PATIENT CHAU, PHUONG DOING BUSINESS AS TAMPA BAY ORTHOPEDIC AND SPINE

7171 N Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

C/O Chief Financial Officer 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W MICHAEL SKIRVIN

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 North Federal Hwy

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL J PETRI, ESQ

Attorney at ROIG LAWYERS

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1350

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/19/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

05/21/2021: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

04/07/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom327237396

03/30/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

COMPLAINT E-FILED

03/24/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

03/24/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 5; Party: PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 3; Party: PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WALL HEALTHCARE INC; Total Financial Assessment; 90.00; Total Payments and Credits; 90.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-11877; WALL HEALTHCARE INC; (90.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WALL HEALTHCARE INC; Total Financial Assessment; 90.00; Total Payments and Credits; 90.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALL HEALTHCARE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer W MICHAEL SKIRVIN