Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 04/25/2021 at 07:00:30 (UTC).

WALL HEALTHCARE INC , DOING BUSINESS AS TAMPA BAY ORTHOPEDIC AND SPINE, AS PATIENT SEYED ARMAN RANJBAR NAVAZI Vs. OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/04/2021 WALL HEALTHCARE INC , DOING BUSINESS AS TAMPA BAY ORTHOPEDIC AND SPINE, AS PATIENT SEYED ARMAN RANJBAR NAVAZI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-SC

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALL HEALTHCARE INC AS PATIENT NAVAZI, SEYED ARMAN RANJBAR DOING BUSINESS AS TAMPA BAY ORTHOPEDIC AND SPINE

7171 N Federal Hwy

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W MICHAEL SKIRVIN

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 North Federal Hwy

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

LAWRENCE D POPRITKIN, ESQ

Attorney at LDP LAW & ASSOCIATES

11555 Heron Bay Blvd Ste 100-A

Coral Springs, FL 33076

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/21/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

04/13/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom327372818

04/07/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

04/04/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

COMPLAINT E-FILED

04/04/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

04/04/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 5; AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Party: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 4; Party: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WALL HEALTHCARE INC; Total Financial Assessment; 90.00; Total Payments and Credits; 90.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-13227; WALL HEALTHCARE INC; (90.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WALL HEALTHCARE INC; Total Financial Assessment; 90.00; Total Payments and Credits; 90.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALL HEALTHCARE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Popritkin, Lawrence Dean