This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:06:44 (UTC).

VINCENT SULLIVAN Vs. SONJA CASTEL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 VINCENT SULLIVAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SONJA CASTEL. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, PETER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-FD

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, PETER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SULLIVAN, VINCENT

Treasure Island, FL 33707

Respondent

CASTEL, SONJA

Treasure Island, FL 33707

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

ANASTASIA C JASTER, ESQ

Attorney at HOLISTIC FAMILY LAW PLLC

6401 - 1St Ave South Ste 1

St Petersburg, FL 33707

ANASTASIA C JASTER

Attorney at HOLISTIC FAMILY LAW PLLC

6401 - 1St Ave South Ste 1

St Petersburg, FL 33707

Respondent Attorney

PAUL KNUDSEN, ESQ

Attorney at DENMON PEARLMAN P A

520 - 2Nd Ave S

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT; Doc # 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Doc # 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 24; 02122020 10:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCE; Doc # 25; 02122020 12:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; Doc # 19; 02122020 10:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 20; HIS AMENDED FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Doc # 21; SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT; Doc # 17; WITH NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketLIST OF EXHIBITS; Doc # 15; (PETITIONER EVIDENCE - BOX FD-6)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 7; EMERGENCY 122019 1:00 BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS); Doc # 8; ISSUED; Party: CASTEL, SONJA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; SULLIVAN, VINCENT; Total Financial Assessment; 428.00; Total Payments and Credits; 428.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46044; SULLIVAN, VINCENT; (418.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; SULLIVAN, VINCENT; Total Financial Assessment; 428.00; Total Payments and Credits; 428.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION WITH MINOR CHILDREN; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S EMERGENCY MOTION; Doc # 3; FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less