Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/14/2021 at 19:39:58 (UTC).

VICTORIA BOYKIN, et al Vs. MANISHI G MUKHERJEE, MD, et al

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 VICTORIA BOYKIN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MANISHI G MUKHERJEE, MD. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAY, JACK and RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAY, JACK

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOYKIN, TERRY

Tampa, FL 33602

BOYKIN, VICTORIA

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

MORALES, LUIS EMILIO, MD

St. Petersburg, FL 33712

INTRALIGN FL LLC

100 North Tampa Street Suite 1800

Tampa, FL 33602

MUKHERJEE, MANISHI G, MD

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

GALENCARE DOING BUSINESS AS NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARC MATTHEWS

Attorney at McINTYRE THANASIDES et al PA

500 E Kennedy Blvd #200

Tampa, FL 33602

HELEN STRATIGAKOS

412 E Madison St Ste 814

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

ERIN M DIAZ, ESQ

Attorney at WICKER SMITH OHARA

100 N Tampa St Ste 1800

Tampa, FL 33602

GAIL F MOULDS, ESQ

Attorney at DEACON MOULDS AND STOFER

100 Second Ave S Ste 902S

St Petersburg, FL 33701-4337

JOSEPH F KINMAN JR, ESQ

Attorney at BEYTIN MCLAUGHLIN MCLAUGHLIN

1706 E Eleventh Ave

Tampa, FL 33605

PAUL R BORR

Attorney at TACHE BRONIS CHRISTIANSON

150 Se Second Ave Ste 600

Miami, FL 33131

MARK R BERLICK

Attorney at BEYTIN MCLAUGHLIN MCLAUGHLIN

1706 E 11 Ave

Tampa, FL 33605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

05/24/2018: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

03/16/2018: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/06/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/06/2018: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/09/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/15/2017: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

12/14/2017: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF FILING

10/31/2017: NOTICE OF FILING

ACCEPTANCE

10/17/2017: ACCEPTANCE

NOTICE

05/22/2018: NOTICE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

05/09/2018: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/07/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/21/2018: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF FILING

01/03/2018: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF FILING

01/03/2018: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/10/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF FILING

10/31/2017: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/19/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketMASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 99; MORALES, LUIS EMILIO, MD / GALENCARE; Vol./Book 20678, Page 725, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketDISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer DAY, JACK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketFINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Doc # 97; AS TO INTRALIGN FL LLC; Vol./Book 20118, Page 1262, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 96; W/PREJUDICE AS TO MANISHI G MUKHERJEE MD; Vol./Book 20114, Page 2302, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Doc # 95; FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE AS TO DEFT MANISHI G MUKHERJEE M D ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Doc # 94; FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE AS TO INTRALIGN FL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 92; OF DEPOSITION VIA VIDEO-CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 93; OF VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 11; Party: INTRALIGN FL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketACCEPTANCE; Doc # 5; OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BOYKIN, VICTORIA; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-28407; BOYKIN, VICTORIA; (420.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BOYKIN, VICTORIA; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: GALENCARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: MORALES, LUIS EMILIO, MD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAUL R BORR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARK BERLICK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEPH F KINMAN JR, ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOULDS GAIL F