This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 09/24/2021 at 07:07:40 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC Vs. SHARON M RIPPLE

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHARON M RIPPLE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

110 W Columbus Drive

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

RIPPLE, SHARON M

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALI R RAHNAVARD, ESQ

Attorney at O&L LAW GROUP PL

110 W Columbus Dr

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

COREY W SZALAI, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DAMIAN G WALDMAN P A

110333 Seminole Blvd Units 1 And 2

Seminole, FL 33778

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/16/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

09/14/2021: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/14/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom329870947

09/08/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

09/03/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

09/03/2021: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED

09/03/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

09/03/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH); CASE DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 7; WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 5; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL; Party: RIPPLE, SHARON M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS; Doc # 6; AND TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-34412; VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 4; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAHNAVARD ALI R