This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/12/2019 at 08:11:27 (UTC).

US ROF III LEGAL TITLE TRUST 2015 1 BY US BANK Vs. DENIS M PHILLIPS, et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 US ROF III LEGAL TITLE TRUST 2015 1 BY US BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DENIS M PHILLIPS,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-CI

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US ROF III LEGAL TITLE TRUST 2015 1 BY US BANK

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASUR

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DENIS M PHILLIPS

PHILLIPS, SHAY FORMERLY KNOWN AS UNKNOWN TENANT 1

PHILLIPS, DENIS M ALSO KNOWN AS PHILLIPS, DENIS MICHAEL

HARBOUR WATCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC FORMERLY KNOWN AS POINTE ALEXIS NORTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

PHILLIPS, LORI ALSO KNOWN AS PHILLIPS, LORI ANN

POINTE ALEXIS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC FORMERLY KNOWN AS POINTE ALEXIS RECREATION ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMY M KISER, ESQ

Attorney at GILBERT GARCIA GROUP P A

2313 West Violet Street

Tampa, FL 33603

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN F RUDY, III

Attorney at ASSISTANT UNITED STATES ATTY

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

LEE SEGAL, ESQ

Attorney at SEGAL & SCHUH LAW GROUP P L

18167 Us Hwy 19 N Ste 100

Clearwater, FL 33764

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

09/23/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/10/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET

09/13/2019: PLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

09/13/2019: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

09/26/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 31; Party: HARBOUR WATCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; Party: PHILLIPS, DENIS M; Party: PHILLIPS, LORI; Party: PHILLIPS, SHAY; Party: POINTE ALEXIS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DENIS M PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING; Doc # 27; Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 28; ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 26; / EMAIL ADDRESS FOR COUNSEL OF; Party: PHILLIPS, DENIS M; Party: PHILLIPS, LORI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketDISCLAIMER; Doc # 25; (CONDITIONAL) OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 20; 092519; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DENIS M PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 21; 092519; Party: PHILLIPS, DENIS M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 22; 092519; Party: PHILLIPS, LORI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 10; ISSUED; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DENIS M PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 11; ISSUED; Party: PHILLIPS, LORI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 12; ISSUED; Party: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASUR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 13; ISSUED; Party: HARBOUR WATCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 14; ISSUED; Party: POINTE ALEXIS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 15; ISSUED; Party: PHILLIPS, SHAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 16; ISSUED; Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF; US ROF III LEGAL TITLE TRUST 2015 1 BY US BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 2,008.50; Total Payments and Credits; 2,008.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; (1.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF; US ROF III LEGAL TITLE TRUST 2015 1 BY US BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 2,008.50; Total Payments and Credits; 2,008.50; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-34993; US ROF III LEGAL TITLE TRUST 2015 1 BY US BANK; (2,008.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF; US ROF III LEGAL TITLE TRUST 2015 1 BY US BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 2,008.50; Total Payments and Credits; 2,008.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 2,008.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less