This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/19/2021 at 00:10:04 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY Vs. BEACH HOUSE OF PASS A GRILLE CONDOMINIUM INC

Case Summary

On 01/20/2018 UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEACH HOUSE OF PASS A GRILLE CONDOMINIUM INC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CO

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF WILLEY, JOAN B

150 S. Pine Island Road Suite 250

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant

BEACH HOUSE OF PASS A GRILLE CONDOMINIUM INC

9300 N 16Th St

Tampa, FL 33612

Garnishee

FIRST CENTURY BANK NA

807 Dorsey Street

Gainesville, GA 30501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARY M CANTWELL

Attorney at MARKCITY ROTHMAN et al PA

150 S Pine Island Rd Ste 250

Plantation, FL 33324

SCOTT B CHAPMAN

Attorney at CHAPMAN LAW FIRM PA

7200 W Camino Real Ste 102

Boca Raton, FL 33433

Defendant Attorneys

DANIEL A CHEHOURI, ESQ

Attorney at LYDECKER DIAZ LLC

4350 W Cypress St Ste 910

Tampa, FL 33607

SHAUN R KOBY, ESQ

Attorney at LYDECKER DIAZ LLC

4350 W Cypress St Ste 910

Tampa, FL 33607

MEGAN WILLIAMS, ESQ

Attorney at LYDECKER DIAZ LLC

4350 W Cypress St Ste 910

Tampa, FL 33607

MEGAN A WILLIAMS, ESQ

Attorney at LYDECKER DIAZ LLC

4350 W Cypress St Ste 910

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/08/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

DEF-RESP'S EMERGENCY MOTION

11/01/2018: DEF-RESP'S EMERGENCY MOTION

DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/29/2018: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/29/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

10/26/2018: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

07/10/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK

05/15/2018: INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

03/13/2018: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

01/20/2018: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

DEF-RESP'S EMERGENCY MOTION

10/31/2018: DEF-RESP'S EMERGENCY MOTION

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

10/30/2018: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

10/29/2018: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

10/22/2018: MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

07/13/2018: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

07/10/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

05/15/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/20/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

11/09/2018: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketNON RECORDED SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Doc # 38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 37; OF PLAINTIFF'S VOLUNTARY DISSOLUTION OF WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET; Doc # 36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 34; OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUANCE AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 35; ANSWER OF GARNISHEE UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 33; ATTACHED SUPPLEMENTAL CASE LAW RELATED TO DEFT'S EMERGENCY MOTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS/VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT/VACATE DEFAULT/DISSOLVE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT/STAY EXECUTION OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING MEMO OF LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 31; FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 32; 112718 1:30 (CROSS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 30; 112718 1:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 29; ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT OF RICHARD WOLEVER IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S MOTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 8; Party: BEACH HOUSE OF PASS A GRILLE CONDOMINIUM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 6; DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketINSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK; Doc # 7; ENTER DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 5; 020718; Party: BEACH HOUSE OF PASS A GRILLE CONDOMINIUM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 395.00; Total Payments and Credits; 395.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2018-02217; UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 395.00; Total Payments and Credits; 395.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2018
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: BEACH HOUSE OF PASS A GRILLE CONDOMINIUM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST CENTURY BANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL A CHEHOURI, ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Koby, Shaun, ESQ.