This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:02:52 (UTC).

UDR INC Vs. JOSEPH SPAGNA, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 UDR INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOSEPH SPAGNA. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UDR INC

Po Box 62884

Ft Myers, FL 33906

Defendants

SPAGNA, JOSEPH

Clearwater, FL 33765

TESCHBERG, ERICA

Clearwater, FL 33765

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN P WOLK

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HEIST WEISSE & WOLK PA

Post Office Box 62884

Fort Myers, FL 33906

 

Court Documents

THREE DAY NOTICE

12/06/2019: THREE DAY NOTICE

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

12/06/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

12/19/2019: VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/19/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/26/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/19/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

LEASE

12/06/2019: LEASE

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/10/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/09/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

WRIT OF POSSESSION

12/30/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 17; EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 16; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 15; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20832, Page 2452, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 9; 121119; Party: SPAGNA, JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 10; 121119; Party: TESCHBERG, ERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketVERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 12; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 13; Party: UDR INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 8; Party: SPAGNA, JOSEPH; Party: TESCHBERG, ERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; UDR INC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46072; UDR INC; (205.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; UDR INC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketLEASE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: SPAGNA, JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 7; ISSUED; Party: TESCHBERG, ERICA

    Read MoreRead Less