This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 08/30/2021 at 20:02:43 (UTC).

TY PARRISH Vs. DOUGLAS DORT

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 TY PARRISH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DOUGLAS DORT. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, AMY M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, AMY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARRISH, TY

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

DORT, DOUGLAS

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R RYAN SAINZ

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN TAMPA PA

One Tampa City Center 201 No Franklin St 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

DONNA FERRELL, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J SMITH

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 800

Tampa, FL 33602-5173

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/20/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/05/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/05/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/05/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER

07/05/2021: ANSWER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/05/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS - SERVED

06/22/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

08/20/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/01/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/01/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/01/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

06/01/2021: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

COMPLAINT

06/01/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS - ISSUED

06/01/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

06/01/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 9; AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS; Party: DORT, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Doc # 10; TO COMPLAINT; Party: DORT, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 11; TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 8; 06142021; Party: DORT, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; PARRISH, TY; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-21825; PARRISH, TY; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; PARRISH, TY; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 2; Party: DORT, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer R RYAN SAINZ