This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 02/14/2022 at 09:24:00 (UTC).

TRUVIEWMOLD LLC , AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR CORA DIXON Vs. PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 TRUVIEWMOLD LLC , AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR CORA DIXON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRUVIEWMOLD LLC

TRUVIEWMOLD LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR DIXON, CORA

Defendant

PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID GARCIA, ESQ

ARISTIDES JUAN DIAZ, ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

LINDSEY HALLIGAN

ADAM SHAMIR, ESQ

LINDSEY HALLIGAN, ESQ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/20/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DEF-RESP'S MOTION

04/02/2021: DEF-RESP'S MOTION

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom326434502

02/08/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

NOTICE

03/12/2021: NOTICE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/20/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/20/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/20/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/20/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

01/20/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketMASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 17; PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY; Vol./Book 21925, Page 252, 8 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS - CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 15; ATTACHED VERIFICATION PAGE AUTHENTICATING DEFT ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Doc # 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); JOINT STIPULATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION; Doc # 11; TO TRANSFER, WITH ATTACHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketWAIVER; Doc # 9; OF APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER GRANTING MOTN TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 7; 02082021; Party: PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TRUVIEWMOLD LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-02952; TRUVIEWMOLD LLC; (185.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TRUVIEWMOLD LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 2; NOT USED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less