This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 09/04/2021 at 08:11:03 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK Vs. LINDA M PIECK

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 TRUIST BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LINDA M PIECK. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY, LORRAINE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CO

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY, LORRAINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUIST BANK

5104 S Westshore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611

Defendant

PIECK, LINDA M

Clearwater, FL 33763-3016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RALPH S MARCADIS, ESQ

Attorney at MARCADIS SINGER, P.A.

5104 South Westshore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION

07/29/2021: STIPULATION

SUMMONS - SERVED

08/02/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

07/06/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

EXHIBIT

07/06/2021: EXHIBIT

SUMMONS - ISSUED

07/06/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

COMPLAINT E-FILED

07/06/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

07/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketORDER APPROVING (R); Doc # 8; (AGREED) STIPULATION AND DISMISSING CASE W/OUT PREJUDICE; Vol./Book 21663, Page 2406, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY - CASE DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 7/27/2021; Party: PIECK, LINDA M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Doc # 6; TO STAY ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TRUIST BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-26605; TRUIST BANK; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TRUIST BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: PIECK, LINDA M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; - ARTICLES OF AMENDMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcadis, Ralph S