This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 12/01/2018 at 16:16:01 (UTC).

TROY PAYNE, et al Vs. LISA SMITHSON

Case Summary

On 12/17/2014 TROY PAYNE, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LISA SMITHSON. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAY, JACK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAY, JACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAYNE, TROY

T AND T PROPERTY INVESTMENTS INC

Defendant

SMITHSON, LISA

Garnishee

CHASE BANK

Not Classified By Court

MASSARI, DEBRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LEONARD S ENGLANDER

Attorney at ENGLANDER FISCHER

721 First Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Garnishee Attorney

JOSEPH D WARGO

Attorney at WARGO AND FRENCH

201 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 1000

Miami, FL 33131

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

FINCH BRIANNA

Attorney at FINCH LEGAL PA

3412 W Leona St

Tampa, FL 33629

JULAN MUSTAFA

Attorney at MUSTAFA LAW FIRM PA

Po Box 1487

Elfers, FL 34680

 

Court Documents

DEPOSITION OF

01/06/2016: DEPOSITION OF

EXHIBIT

08/08/2016: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

09/30/2015: EXHIBIT

ORDER

07/27/2016: ORDER

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/17/2014: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EXHIBIT

08/08/2016: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/03/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

EXHIBIT

08/08/2016: EXHIBIT

AFFIDAVIT

01/03/2017: AFFIDAVIT

141 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketEVIDENCE DESTRUCTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer REQUIRED, NO JUDGE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketEVIDENCE DESTROYED; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketINTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE; Doc # 1; LETTER MAILED TO PARTIES/ATTORNEYS FOR PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; OF DEPOSITIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO; TROY PAYNE / 17-BK-00016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION; W/ SIGNATURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION RETD SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION; W/ SIGNATURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION RETD SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION; W/ SIGNATURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
160 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFF; PAYNE, TROY; Total Financial Assessment; 443.00; Total Payments and Credits; 443.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-28376; ENGLANDER, LEONARD SELIG; (24.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFF; PAYNE, TROY; Total Financial Assessment; 443.00; Total Payments and Credits; 443.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 24.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF; PAYNE, TROY; Total Financial Assessment; 443.00; Total Payments and Credits; 443.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-40182; PAYNE, TROY; (9.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF; PAYNE, TROY; Total Financial Assessment; 443.00; Total Payments and Credits; 443.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 9.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • DocketPLAINTIFF; PAYNE, TROY; Total Financial Assessment; 443.00; Total Payments and Credits; 443.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2014-45514; PAYNE, TROY; (410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • DocketPLAINTIFF; PAYNE, TROY; Total Financial Assessment; 443.00; Total Payments and Credits; 443.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT; SMITHSON, LISA; Total Financial Assessment; 445.00; Total Payments and Credits; 445.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-26075; SMITHSON, LISA; (50.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT; SMITHSON, LISA; Total Financial Assessment; 445.00; Total Payments and Credits; 445.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT; SMITHSON, LISA; Total Financial Assessment; 445.00; Total Payments and Credits; 445.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-01574; SMITHSON, LISA; (395.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT; SMITHSON, LISA; Total Financial Assessment; 445.00; Total Payments and Credits; 445.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chase Bank USA NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUSTAFA , JULAN M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINCH , BRIANNA