This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 01/10/2021 at 05:17:01 (UTC).

TRINITY FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC Vs. MELISSA GOODELL, et al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2017 TRINITY FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MELISSA GOODELL,. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AM SQUARED INVESTMENT GROUP LLC

Defendants

GOODELL, MELISSA

GOODELL, STEPHEN

CHEVY CHASE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GIUSEPPE CATAUDELLA, ESQ

 

Court Documents

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

11/13/2019: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/28/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SALE

12/16/2019: NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE

12/16/2019: NOTICE OF SALE

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

11/26/2019: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

AGREED ORDER

01/28/2020: AGREED ORDER

PLTF-PET'S EMERGENCY MOTION

01/26/2020: PLTF-PET'S EMERGENCY MOTION

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

01/28/2020: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

NOTICE OF FILING

11/13/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); ORDER FROM COURT; PER JUDGE MEYER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Doc # 33; RCVD BY COURT 1/27/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Doc # 34; CANCEL SALE FOR 1/28/2020/VACATE FINAL JDMT/DISMISS CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketREOPEN - CLOSED; Doc # 35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketRELEASE-DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS; Doc # 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketCASE REOPENED; Doc # 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S EMERGENCY MOTION; Doc # 30; FOR ORDER TO CANCEL SALE, VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketCASE REOPENED; Doc # 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S EMERGENCY MOTION; Doc # 32; FOR ORDER TO CANCEL SALE, VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketPOST JUDGMENT NOTICE TO SETTLE; Doc # 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketEXHIBIT; MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketEXHIBIT; CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED; Party: GOODELL, MELISSA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED; Party: GOODELL, STEPHEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MELISSA GOODELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED; Party: CHEVY CHASE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED; Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED; Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less