This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/21/2023 at 06:32:28 (UTC).

TONY J BRYANT, III Vs. ERICKA M BRYANT

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 TONY J BRYANT, III filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ERICKA M BRYANT. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ELLIS, DAVID R. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-FD

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ELLIS, DAVID R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRYANT, TONY J, III

Palm Harbor, FL 34684

Respondent

BRYANT, ERICKA M

Palm Harbor, FL 34684

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT Doc # 11; Party:; BRYANT, TONY J, III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 10; 121222; Party:; BRYANT, ERICKA M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 9; Party:; BRYANT, TONY J, III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; BRYANT, TONY J, III; Total Financial Assessment; 22.50; Total Payments and Credits; 22.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # NC-2022-10408; BRYANT, TONY J, III; (6.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; BRYANT, TONY J, III; Total Financial Assessment; 22.50; Total Payments and Credits; 22.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; BRYANT, TONY J, III; Total Financial Assessment; 22.50; Total Payments and Credits; 22.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # NC-2022-10407; BRYANT, TONY J, III; (16.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; BRYANT, TONY J, III; Total Financial Assessment; 22.50; Total Payments and Credits; 22.50; Balance Due 0.00; INDIGENT; 407.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; BRYANT, TONY J, III; Total Financial Assessment; 22.50; Total Payments and Credits; 22.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; BRYANT, TONY J, III; Total Financial Assessment; 22.50; Total Payments and Credits; 22.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 418.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION WITH MINOR CHILDREN Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCERT COMPLIANCE FL FAM RULE 12.285 - MAND DISCLOSURE Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED Doc # 6; Party:; BRYANT, TONY J, III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less