This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 08/21/2022 at 20:05:15 (UTC).

TOMASZ MARKUT Vs. CONMED CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 TOMASZ MARKUT filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CONMED CORPORATION. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARKUT, TOMASZ

Land O Lakes, FL 34638

Defendant

CONMED CORPORATION A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

11311 Concept Blvd

Largo, FL 33773

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON W IMLER, ESQ

Attorney at IMLER LAW

19409 Shumard Oak Dr Unit 103

Land O Lakes, FL 34638

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

05/23/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

05/23/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/24/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING

05/24/2022: NOTICE OF FILING

EXHIBIT

05/24/2022: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF FILING

05/31/2022: NOTICE OF FILING

SUMMONS - SERVED

05/31/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

06/15/2022: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

06/23/2022: MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/28/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/06/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

08/11/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

08/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 15; (UNVERIFIED) (AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 8; Party: CONMED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 6; PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 05252022; Party: CONMED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MARKUT, TOMASZ; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-18207; MARKUT, TOMASZ; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MARKUT, TOMASZ; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: CONMED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 4; EXHIBIT A TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 5; A - CHARGE OF DISCRIMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conmed, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON W IMLER, ESQ