This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 07/05/2021 at 20:01:57 (UTC).

TODD POPPELL Vs. STEPHEN SCRANTON

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 TODD POPPELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEPHEN SCRANTON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JIROTKA, GEORGE M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CI

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JIROTKA, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POPPELL, TODD

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

SCRANTON, STEPHEN

Dunedin, FL 34698

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVE D PARKER

Attorney at HARMON PARKER PA

110 N 11Th St 2Nd Fl

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

JILLIAN M JAMES, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT D TETREAULT

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 550

Tampa, FL 33602

BRANDON R SCHEELE, ESQ

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P A

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

06/23/2021: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/23/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

06/16/2021: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

06/11/2021: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/11/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

06/23/2021: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

06/02/2021: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST FOR COPIES

06/01/2021: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

05/27/2021: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/25/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/17/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

INTERROGATORIES

05/17/2021: INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/17/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

05/17/2021: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/02/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT E-FILED

04/06/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

04/06/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

04/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 20; TO INSPECT CELL PHONE ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 21; 09012021 11:00 TELEPHONIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 22; FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO ADD PUNITIVE DAMAGES FOR DRIVING UNDER THE INFLUENCE OF ALCOHOL, WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Doc # 17; 06162021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 14; Party: SCRANTON, STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOBJECTION; Doc # 16; TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 4; Party: SCRANTON, STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 5; / DISCLOSURE / DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Party: SCRANTON, STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Doc # 6; TO PLAINTIFF W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; POPPELL, TODD; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-13446; POPPELL, TODD; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; POPPELL, TODD; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 2; Party: SCRANTON, STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHEELE, BRANDON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES , JILLIAN MAY