Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 05/23/2021 at 20:15:58 (UTC).

TIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC Vs. MICHAEL J LEWIS. et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 TIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL J LEWIS. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CO

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

1701 Ml King St N

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendants

LEWIS, MICHAEL J

Lake Saint Louis, MO 63367

LEWIS, LESLIE A

Lake Saint Louis, MO 63367

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT E BURGUIERES, ESQ

Attorney at ROBERT E BURGUIERES PA

1701 Dr Mlk Jr St North

St Petersburg, FL 33704

 

Court Documents

ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED

04/26/2021: ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED

ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED

04/26/2021: ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED

ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED

04/20/2021: ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

04/05/2021: SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

04/05/2021: SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED

04/20/2021: ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

03/03/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

03/03/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

02/22/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

02/22/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

COMPLAINT E-FILED

02/22/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

02/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC; Total Financial Assessment; 360.00; Total Payments and Credits; 360.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-10371; TIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC; (20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC; Total Financial Assessment; 360.00; Total Payments and Credits; 360.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 11; Party: LEWIS, LESLIE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 12; Party: LEWIS, MICHAEL J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC; Total Financial Assessment; 360.00; Total Payments and Credits; 360.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-09763; TIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC; (20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC; Total Financial Assessment; 360.00; Total Payments and Credits; 360.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 9; Party: LEWIS, LESLIE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 10; Party: LEWIS, MICHAEL J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT SERVED; Doc # 7; Party: LEWIS, MICHAEL J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT SERVED; Doc # 8; Party: LEWIS, LESLIE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 5; Party: LEWIS, MICHAEL J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 6; Party: LEWIS, LESLIE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC; Total Financial Assessment; 360.00; Total Payments and Credits; 360.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-07136; TIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC; (320.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC; Total Financial Assessment; 360.00; Total Payments and Credits; 360.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1; PER ATTORNEY CASE TO BE FILED IN COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2; WITH DECLARATION AMENDMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT ISSUED NAMES DOES NOT MATCH NAMES ON COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 4; NOT ISSUED NAMES DOES NOT MATCH NAMES ON COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT E BURGUIERES