This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 07/11/2021 at 20:02:31 (UTC).

THOMAS TOLLI Vs. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 THOMAS TOLLI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, AMY M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, AMY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOLLI, THOMAS

Saint Petersburg, FL 33733

Defendants

MILLER, JUSTIN MICHAEL

Largo, FL 33773

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

MILLER, KIMBERLY MARIE

Clearwater, FL 33756

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAD SALTER, ESQ

Attorney at SALTER HEALY RIVERA

10807

St Petersburg, FL 33733

Other Attorneys

BRANDON R SCHEELE, ESQ

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P A

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/22/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

05/24/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

05/24/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/21/2021: DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

05/17/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

CLERK DEFAULT

05/17/2021: CLERK DEFAULT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

05/14/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/10/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/10/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/10/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/10/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

04/27/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

04/27/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

04/27/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

SUMMONS - ISSUED

04/12/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

04/12/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/12/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT

04/12/2021: COMPLAINT

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 52; Party: MILLER, JUSTIN MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 48; OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 49; OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 50; OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 51; OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Doc # 47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 46; Party: MILLER, JUSTIN MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 13; Party: MILLER, JUSTIN MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 14; Party: MILLER, KIMBERLY MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 15; Party: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHEELE, BRANDON