This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/03/2023 at 07:09:19 (UTC).

THE MOLD MAN INC , AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR MAGDIEL HERNANDEZ Vs. STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 THE MOLD MAN INC , AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR MAGDIEL HERNANDEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE MOLD MAN INC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HERNANDEZ, MAGDIEL

800 East Broward Blvd Suite 510

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN J WEISSER

Attorney at WEISSER ELAZAR & KANTOR PLLC

800 East Broward Blvd Suite 510

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

STEPHEN UDAGAWA, ESQ

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/13/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/13/2023: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/13/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/13/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/13/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

01/13/2023: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/13/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom337944429

01/18/2023: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/01/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 8; AND EMAIL DESIGNATION; Party:; STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; THE MOLD MAN INC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2023-01409; THE MOLD MAN INC; (185.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; THE MOLD MAN INC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 6; NOT USED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less