This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/17/2023 at 00:02:31 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF PHOUANGKHAM GINGER HANLOTXOMPHOU Vs. FI HIGHLAND PINES LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 THE ESTATE OF PHOUANGKHAM GINGER HANLOTXOMPHOU filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against FI HIGHLAND PINES LLC,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE ESTATE OF PHOUANGKHAM GINGER HANLOTXOMPHOU BY AND THROUGH HANLOTXOMPHOU, KHAMPHOUTHON LAVINA, PERSONAL REP

Defendants

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS ARIAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS BRIGID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

FI HIGHLAND PINES LLC DOING BUSINESS AS HIGHLAND PINES REHABILITATION CENTER

THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS THEMIS HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADRIAN MEDINA, ESQ

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

06/24/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

06/24/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS-ISSUED

06/24/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS-ISSUED

06/24/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS-ISSUED

06/24/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS-ISSUED

06/24/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

DISMISS MASTER ORDER - NO SERVICE

12/16/2022: MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL - LACK OF SERVICE

SUMMONS - SERVED

11/29/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

MOTION TO DISMISS

12/12/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice336814345-1000

11/11/2022: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice336814345-1001

11/11/2022: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice336814345-1002

11/11/2022: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice336814345-1006

11/11/2022: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice336814345-1007

11/11/2022: DISMISSAL NOTICE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketMASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL - LACK OF SERVICE; Doc # 10; FI HIGHLAND PINES LLC / THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC / BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC / AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC; Vol./Book 22295, Page 1554, 2 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCIVIL - CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF SERVICE; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Doc # 9; FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH STATUTORY CONDITIONS PRECEDENT TO FILING LAWSUIT; Party:; FI HIGHLAND PINES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 8; 11222022; Party:; AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT DISMISS LACK OF SERVICE Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; THE ESTATE OF PHOUANGKHAM GINGER HANLOTXOMPHOU; Total Financial Assessment; 440.00; Total Payments and Credits; 440.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-22749; THE ESTATE OF PHOUANGKHAM GINGER HANLOTXOMPHOU; (440.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; THE ESTATE OF PHOUANGKHAM GINGER HANLOTXOMPHOU; Total Financial Assessment; 440.00; Total Payments and Credits; 440.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 440.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party:; FI HIGHLAND PINES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party:; THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 5; Party:; BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 6; Party:; AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less