This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/17/2023 at 21:38:53 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF PELZIE LEON MICHAEL III Vs. EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 THE ESTATE OF PELZIE LEON MICHAEL III filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE ESTATE OF PELZIE LEON MICHAEL III

Defendants

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC

STONE, DEBORAH A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAINEY C BOOTH JR, ESQ

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

07/19/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

07/19/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS - ISSUED

07/19/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

07/19/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

07/19/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

07/19/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

07/19/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

07/19/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

08/24/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

MOTION TO COMPEL

08/16/2022: MOTION TO COMPEL

MOTION

08/16/2022: MOTION

RESPONSE

11/03/2022: RESPONSE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 12; IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL; Doc # 9; ARBITRATION W/ ATTACHED EXHIBITS A- COPY OF COMPLAINT; Party:; EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketMOTION; Doc # 10; TO STAY AND DEMAND FOR ARBITRATION W/ ATTACHMENT; Filed by:; AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC; Filed by:; BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC; Filed by:; HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC; Filed by:; STONE, DEBORAH A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; THE ESTATE OF PELZIE LEON MICHAEL III; Total Financial Assessment; 450.00; Total Payments and Credits; 450.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-25941; THE ESTATE OF PELZIE LEON MICHAEL III; (450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; THE ESTATE OF PELZIE LEON MICHAEL III; Total Financial Assessment; 450.00; Total Payments and Credits; 450.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party:; EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party:; HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 5; Party:; BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 6; Party:; AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 7; Party:; STONE, DEBORAH A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less