This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/19/2023 at 18:36:34 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF MARIE L HUNT Vs. BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 THE ESTATE OF MARIE L HUNT filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEWTON, CYNTHIA J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE ESTATE OF MARIE L HUNT BY AND THROUGH HUNT, EDWARD ROBERT, PERSONAL REP

Defendants

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC ALSO KNOWN AS BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS BRIGID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

CHR GULFPORT LLC AS TO BOCA CIEGA CENTER

HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL K BECK, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

KRISTEN OVER, ESQ

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

09/20/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

09/20/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

EXHIBIT

09/20/2022: EXHIBIT

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

09/20/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

SUMMONS - ISSUED

09/20/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

09/20/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

09/20/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

09/20/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

09/20/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

11/21/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 10; Party:; AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC; Party:; BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC; Party:; BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC; Party:; CHR GULFPORT LLC; Party:; HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; THE ESTATE OF MARIE L HUNT; Total Financial Assessment; 450.00; Total Payments and Credits; 450.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-34332; THE ESTATE OF MARIE L HUNT; (450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; THE ESTATE OF MARIE L HUNT; Total Financial Assessment; 450.00; Total Payments and Credits; 450.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A LETTER OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 5; Party:; HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 6; Party:; BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 7; Party:; AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 8; Party:; CHR GULFPORT LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 9; Party:; BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less